Jeff Chojnacki v. Lexington Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Chojnacki
Defendant: Does 1-20 and Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv06377
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #6 filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company. (Wagoner, James)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #6 filed by Plaintiff Jeff Chojnacki. (Derbarseghian, Arn)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (DKT. #6 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from January 11, 2021 to February 1, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2021. (cw)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lexington Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of James P. Wagoner in Support of Lexington Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Lexington's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #4 Declaration of Lisa Landen in Support of Lexington Insurance Company's Request for Judicial Notice) (Wagoner, James)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pbl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The civil cover sheet and corporate disclosure statement are attached to the notice of removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You are not required to respond to this notice unless the Court directs you to do so. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Lexington Insurance Company, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Jeff Chojnacki. (filed in state court 5/7/20, submitted as document 1, p. 8) (esa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV17509 Receipt No: ACACDC-27252675 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Declaration of James P. Wagoner in Support of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441(B)) (Attorney James P Wagoner added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Wagoner, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeff Chojnacki v. Lexington Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Chojnacki
Represented By: Amir Abdizadeh
Represented By: Arn Derbarseghian
Represented By: Amir Abbas Abdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria E. Valencia Camberos
Represented By: Lejf Edwin Knutson
Represented By: James P Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?