It's My Seat, Inc., et al v. Hartford Capital, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: It's My Seat, Inc. and Vahe Shahinian
Defendant: Bryan Stein, Ein Cap, Inc., Kevin Woodley, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Russell Naftali, Hartford Capital LLC, Gene Slavin, Craig Walters, Craig Leszczak and Boris Shiteyngart
Case Number: 2:2020cv06378
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ein Cap, Inc., Russell Naftali, Gene Slavin, (Lim, S)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Hartford Capital LLC, Craig Leszczak, Bryan Stein, Craig Walters, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/17/2020. (Zheng, Yalan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:Ein Cap, Inc., Russell Naftali, Gene Slavin Joinder in Notice of Removal #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): 1)Case Number incomplete and must include initials of the assigned Judge and Magistrates as: 2:20cv06378 ODW (AFMx), see docket no. 4. 2)Please be advised Filer failed to record themselves as attorneys of record upon filing of the Joinder. Clerk has added attorneys accordingly so that notice of electronic filings can be issued to them. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 JOINDER filed by Defendants Ein Cap, Inc., Russell Naftali, Gene Slavin joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Lim, S)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Ein Cap, Inc., Hartford Capital LLC, Craig Leszczak, Russell Naftali, Gene Slavin, Bryan Stein, Craig Walters, Kevin Woodley, filed by plaintiffs Vahe Shahinian, It's My Seat, Inc. (filed in state court 10/28/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant WALTERS CRAIG, HARTFORD CAPITAL LLC, BRYAN STEIN, (Zheng, Yalan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants WALTERS CRAIG, HARTFORD CAPITAL LLC, BRYAN STEIN. (Zheng, Yalan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV38852 Receipt No: ACACDC-27252823 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant WALTERS CRAIG, HARTFORD CAPITAL LLC, BRYAN STEIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Attorney Yalan Zheng added to party WALTERS CRAIG (pty:dft), Attorney Yalan Zheng added to party HARTFORD CAPITAL LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Yalan Zheng added to party BRYAN STEIN(pty:dft))(Zheng, Yalan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: It's My Seat, Inc., et al v. Hartford Capital, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Stein
Represented By: Stella K Park
Represented By: Yalan Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ein Cap, Inc.
Represented By: S Young Lim
Represented By: Jessie Y Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Woodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Naftali
Represented By: S Young Lim
Represented By: Jessie Y Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Capital LLC
Represented By: Stella K Park
Represented By: Yalan Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Slavin
Represented By: S Young Lim
Represented By: Jessie Y Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Walters
Represented By: Stella K Park
Represented By: Yalan Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Leszczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boris Shiteyngart
Represented By: Stella K Park
Represented By: Yalan Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: It's My Seat, Inc.
Represented By: Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Represented By: Timothy George McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vahe Shahinian
Represented By: Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Represented By: Timothy George McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?