Melinda Hunsicker v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melinda Hunsicker
Defendant: Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and DOES 1 to 250, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06382
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-6 days, filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Homelite Consumer Products, Inc... (Williams, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Homelite Consumer Products, Inc..(Williams, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Melinda Hunsicker. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meet and Confer Letter, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND) (Alch, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 PLEADING AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by PLAINTIFF Melinda Hunsicker(Alch, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by PLAINTIFF Melinda Hunsicker. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meet and Confer Letter) (Alch, Thomas)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM. See order for further details. (jre)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-06382 PSG(Ex). (rn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Homelite Consumer Products, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/15/2020, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Melinda Hunsicker in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/14/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., identifying Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. The Home Depot, Inc.; Homelite Consumer Products, Inc. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.; Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd.. (Williams, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Homelite Consumer Products, Inc.. (Williams, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV14415 Receipt No: ACACDC-27253363 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Jeffrey R Williams added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey R Williams added to party Homelite Consumer Products, Inc.(pty:dft))(Williams, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melinda Hunsicker v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Hunsicker
Represented By: Thomas S Alch
Represented By: David R Shoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homelite Consumer Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R Williams
Represented By: Andrew Jason Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R Williams
Represented By: Andrew Jason Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 250, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?