Frank Ortiz v. Backyard Products LLC
Plaintiff: Frank Ortiz
Defendant: Backyard Products LLC and DOES 1 to 40, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06411
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Backyard Products LLC, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Frank Ortiz in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/27/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Defendant Backyard Products LLC (Babataher, Joshua)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Adverse Parties filed by Defendant Backyard Products LLC. (Babataher, Joshua)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Backyard Products LLC. (Babataher, Joshua)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Backyard Products LLC. (Babataher, Joshua)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Backyard Products LLC, served on July 17, 2020. (Babataher, Joshua)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lancaster Superior Court, case number 19AVCV00477 Receipt No: ACACDC-27258182 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Backyard Products LLC. (Attorney Joshua K Babataher added to party Backyard Products LLC(pty:dft))(Babataher, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Ortiz v. Backyard Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ortiz
Represented By: Steve Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backyard Products LLC
Represented By: Joshua K Babataher
Represented By: Eugene J Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 40, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?