Lucinda Caldera v. Tidewater Finance Company
Plaintiff: Lucina Caldera
Defendant: Tidewater Finance Company and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them,
Case Number: 2:2020cv06412
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tidewater Finance Company answer now due 9/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Tidewater Finance Company.(Abugheida, Ali)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Mohammed Abugheida on behalf of Defendant Tidewater Finance Company (Attorney Ali Mohammed Abugheida added to party Tidewater Finance Company(pty:dft))(Abugheida, Ali)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pbl)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tidewater Finance Company. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lucina Caldera, (Friedman, Todd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lucina Caldera. (Friedman, Todd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lucina Caldera. (Friedman, Todd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27258429 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lucina Caldera. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Lucina Caldera(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucinda Caldera v. Tidewater Finance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucina Caldera
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Finance Company
Represented By: Ali Mohammed Abugheida
Represented By: Fredrick S Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?