Harvest Rock Church, Inc. et al v. Gavin Newsom
Plaintiff: Harvest International Ministry, Inc. and Harvest Rock Church, Inc.
Defendant: Gov. Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 2:2020cv06414
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
2 Judge: Patrick J Walsh
3 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #4 ). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #50 filed by Harvest Rock Church, Inc., Harvest International Ministry, Inc.. CCA # 20-55907. The appeal filed August 28, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal.Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. [See document for more details.] (mat)
August 31, 2020 Filing 51 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55907 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #50 as to plaintiff Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (twdb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-27840158.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Schmid, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #47 . (twdb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #44 , Notice (Other), #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion (for order); Declaration. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Seth)
August 24, 2020 Filing 46 OBJECTIONS to New Evidence Submitted by Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom. (Goldstein, Seth)
August 21, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Che Ahn Supplementing the Record on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pastor Che Ahn to Supplement the Record on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Pastor Che Ahn)(Schmid, Daniel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Schmid, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Gavin Newsom for Court Reporter. (Grabarsky, Todd)
August 12, 2020 Filing 42 MINUTES OF Telephone Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. #4 ) held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. A separate order will be issued. Court Reporter: Phyllis A. Preston. (twdb)
August 11, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Che Ahn Supplementing the Record on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Che Ahn, Pastor of Harvest Rock Church, Inc., #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Che Ahn)(Schmid, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #38 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs may submit a reply brief limited to 17 pages. (twdb)
August 10, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Local Rule 6.1 Written notice of motion lacking or timeliness of notice incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limitation) (Schmid, Daniel)
August 7, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY in Support Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Governor's COVID-19 Prohibitions on Religious Worship Services #4 filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ventura County v. Godspeak Calvary Chapel)(Schmid, Daniel)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel J Scmid APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest Rock Church, Inc. and Harvest International Ministry, Inc., for itself and on behalf of its members, designating Nicolaie Cocis as local counsel. (bm)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Roger K. Gannam APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest Rock Church, Inc. and Harvest International Ministry, Inc., for itself and on behalf of its members, designating Nicolaie Cocis as local counsel. (bm)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Horatio G. Mihet APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest Rock Church, Inc. and Harvest International Ministry, Inc., for itself and on behalf of its members, designating Nicolaie Cocis as local counsel. (bm)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew D. Staver APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest Rock Church, Inc. and Harvest International Ministry, Inc., for itself and on behalf of its members, designating Nicolaie Cocis as local counsel. (bm)
August 4, 2020 Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The hearing on the Motion for preliminary injunction is hereby set for 8/12/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. A reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 8/7/2020. The hearing will be telephonic. The clerk shall provide counsel with a teleconference number prior to the hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 OPPOSITION Opposition re: Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Governor's COVID-19 Prohibitions on Religious Worship Services #4 filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Goldstein, #2 Declaration of James Watt, M.D.)(Goldstein, Seth)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING #29 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Defendants time to file a responsive pleading is extended to 21 days after this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs preliminary injunction motion. (lc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Seth E Goldstein added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Seth)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 27, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. Amendment to Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #11 Amended Proposed Order (Schmid, Daniel)
July 27, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. Amendment to Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #9 Amended Proposed Order and Supplemental Certificate of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Schmid, Daniel)
July 26, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Todd Grabarsky on behalf of Defendant Gavin Newsom (Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Grabarsky, Todd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel J. Schmid to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335863) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Case number is missing on proposed order. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Horatio G. Mihet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335732) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Case number is missing on proposed order. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mathew D. Staver to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335534) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Roger K. Gannam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335801) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is missing on proposed order. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-00755 JGB(KKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06414 JGB(KKx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.to Notice of Related Case(s) #19 and Opposition to Reassigning Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmid, Daniel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Gavin Newsom. Related Case(s): 5:20-cv-00755-JGB-KK (Grabarsky, Todd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel J. Schmid to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335863) filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schmid, Daniel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Roger K. Gannam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335801) filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schmid, Daniel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Horatio G. Mihet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335732) filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schmid, Daniel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mathew D. Staver to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335534) filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Daniel J Schmid added to party Harvest International Ministry, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel J Schmid added to party Harvest Rock Church, Inc.(pty:pla)) (Schmid, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Schmid Providing Proof of Electronic Service and Acceptance of Service by Defendant filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmid, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel J Schmid on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Roger K Gannam on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Horatio G Mihet on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mathew D Staver on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendant Gavin Newsom. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On July 18, 2020, Plaintiffs Harvest Rock Church, Inc., and Harvest InternationalMinistry, Inc. filed a Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Gavin Newsom in his official capacity as Governor of the State of California #4 . As Harvest Rock fails to satisfy the requirements for a TRO without notice, the Court DENIES Harvest Rocks Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Harvest Rock also moves for a preliminary injunction. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Harvest Rock to (1) serve Governor Newsom with a copy of the Complaint, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and this Order, and (2) file with the Court a Proof of Service reflecting such notice, no later than July 27, 2020. Upon such notice, Governor Newsom shall respond to Harvest Rocks Motion for a Preliminary Injunction no later than August 3, 2020. (lc)
July 18, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Governor's COVID-19 Prohibitions on Religious Worship Services filed by Plaintiff Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order) (Schmid, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Schmid, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Harvest International Ministry, Inc., Harvest Rock Church, Inc. (Schmid, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27261922 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Harvest Rock Church, Inc, Harvest International Ministry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y) (Attorney Daniel J Schmid added to party Harvest International Ministry, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel J Schmid added to party Harvest Rock Church, Inc(pty:pla))(Schmid, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvest Rock Church, Inc. et al v. Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Seth E Goldstein
Represented By: Todd Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest International Ministry, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolaie Cocis
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Daniel J Schmid
Represented By: Mathew D Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest Rock Church, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolaie Cocis
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Daniel J Schmid
Represented By: Mathew D Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?