David Abitbol et al v. Talent.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Orlene Nosek and David Abitbol
Defendant: Talent.com, Inc., DOES 1-10, Neuvoo, Inc., a Canadian corporation and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06415
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/19/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Talent.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vartanian, Kristapor)
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek, upon Defendant Talent.com, Inc. served on 7/30/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bryan Yee, Assistant in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kolbus, Heather)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Talent.com, Inc. answer now due 9/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Talent.com, Inc..(Attorney Kristapor Vartanian added to party Talent.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Vartanian, Kristapor)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #13 Non-Resident Attorney Heather A. Kolbus APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Abitbol and Orlene Nosek, designating John R. Habashy as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Heather A. Kolbus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27530155) filed by plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Buda, Tiffany)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #6 Non-Resident Attorney Cathleen M. Combs APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Abitbol and Orlene Nosek, designating John R. Habashy as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #5 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel A. Edelman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Abitbol and Orlene Nosek, designating John R. Habashy as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06415 FMO(RAOx). (rn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Talent.com, Inc. (car)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
July 19, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cathleen M. Combs to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27265117) filed by plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Buda, Tiffany)
July 19, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel A. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27265110) filed by plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Buda, Tiffany)
July 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek, identifying TALENT.COM, INC.. (Buda, Tiffany)
July 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek. (Buda, Tiffany)
July 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek. (Buda, Tiffany)
July 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27264970 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff David Abitbol, Orlene Nosek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Tiffany Noelle Buda added to party David Abitbol(pty:pla), Attorney Tiffany Noelle Buda added to party Orlene Nosek(pty:pla))(Buda, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Abitbol et al v. Talent.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talent.com, Inc.
Represented By: Kristapor Vartanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuvoo, Inc., a Canadian corporation
Represented By: Kristapor Vartanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlene Nosek
Represented By: Tiffany Noelle Buda
Represented By: Daniel A Edelman
Represented By: Cathleen M Combs
Represented By: John R Habashy
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Abitbol
Represented By: Tiffany Noelle Buda
Represented By: Daniel A Edelman
Represented By: Cathleen M Combs
Represented By: John R Habashy
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?