Veronica Gabriela Guzman v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Veronica Gabriela Guzman
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv06416
Filed: July 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-6416 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Paul H Sachelari added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Veronica Gabriela Guzman. (Shapiro, Brian)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Veronica Gabriela Guzman, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 7/31/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shapiro, Brian)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated March 2020) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (car)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Veronica Gabriela Guzman, (Shapiro, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Veronica Gabriela Guzman. (Shapiro, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Veronica Gabriela Guzman. (Shapiro, Brian)
July 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27264047 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Veronica Gabriela Guzman. (Attorney Brian C Shapiro added to party Veronica Gabriela Guzman (pty:pla))(Shapiro, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veronica Gabriela Guzman v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul H Sachelari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Gabriela Guzman
Represented By: Brian C Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?