Grace Cho v. Marc Ittah et al
Plaintiff: GRACE CHO
Defendant: MARC ITTAH and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2020cv06475
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING Supplemental Jurisdiction and DISMISSING Plaintiff's State-Law Claims by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's state-law claims. The Court therefore dismisses those claims without prejudice. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (et)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Grace Choto Order to Show Cause #10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to Order to Show Cause no later than 8/7/2020. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (sw)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Marc Ittah. (car)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 GRACE CHO. (Kim, Jason)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GRACE CHO. (Kim, Jason)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27293994 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party GRACE CHO(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grace Cho v. Marc Ittah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC ITTAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE CHO
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?