Ritual Coffee Roasters, Inc. v. SK Energy Americas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ritual Coffee Roasters, Inc.
Defendant: Brad Lucas, SK Energy Americas, Inc., Vitol Inc., SK Trading International Co. Ltd. and David Niemann
Petitioner: Ritual Coffee Roasters Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv06486
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:20-cv-05213 filed 7/29/2020. (iv)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE The People Of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Supplement San Francisco Superior Court Notice of Related Case pursuant to CRC 3.300)(Battaglia, Michael)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DKT. #12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. This action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. The Order to Show Cause Why this Action Should Not Be Transferred to the Northern District of California (Dkt. #11 ), is DISCHARGED. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Change Venue to Northern District of California filed by Plaintiff Ritual Coffee Roasters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Transfer Venue)(Gross, Terry)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be transferred to the Northern District. The parties shall respond to this Order to Show Cause, or file notices of non-opposition to the transfer, on or before 8/7/2020. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-04312 JAK(PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06486 JAK(PJWx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ritual Coffee Roasters, Inc.. (Gross, Terry)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately and in the correct event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Brad Lucas, David Niemann, SK Energy Americas, Inc., SK Trading International Co. Ltd., Vitol Inc. (car)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ritual Coffee Roasters Inc. (Gross, Terry)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ritual Coffee Roasters Inc. (Gross, Terry)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27296910 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ritual Coffee Roasters Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Terry Gross added to party Ritual Coffee Roasters Inc(pty:bkmov))(Gross, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritual Coffee Roasters, Inc. v. SK Energy Americas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ritual Coffee Roasters Inc
Represented By: Terry Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Energy Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitol Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Trading International Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Niemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritual Coffee Roasters, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Gross
Represented By: Adam Chaim Belsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?