Deion Walker v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deion Walker
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc. and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06498
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 Receipt from Superior Court of California of This court's order of remand issued on 10/13/20. (yl)
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court,. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court,. (yl)
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion to remand #20 and DENIES Defendants motion to dismiss as moot by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion to remand and DENIES Defendants motion to dismiss as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See minutes for further details) Remanded to 20STCV16019. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (yl)
October 5, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Morgan, Shon)
October 5, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Deion Walker. (Hill, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Baumann, #2 Exhibit A to Baumann Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Baumann Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon)
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Plaintiff Deion Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Service)(Hill, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Based on the Court's directive, PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #20 is ADVANCED from 11/02/20 to 10/19/20 at 1:30pm. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rosemary Carol Khoury counsel for Plaintiff Deion Walker. Adding Rosemary C. Khoury as counsel of record for Deion Walker for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Deion Walker. (Attorney Rosemary Carol Khoury added to party Deion Walker(pty:pla))(Khoury, Rosemary)
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Deion Walker. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of J. Jason Hill, #3 Proposed Order, #4 of Service) (Hill, James)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: MOTION TO REMAND #17 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other: The hearing date selected is closed for NEW motions. See Calendars>Motion Calendar. (bm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Remand #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion is noticed for a date that is closed on the court's calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 8/25/2020. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Deion Walker. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of J. Jason Hill, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of Service) (Hill, James) Modified on 8/25/2020 (bm).
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Based on the Court's directive, the MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 is continued to 10/19/2020 at 1:30pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #5 filed by Plaintiff Deion Walker. (Hill, James)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06498 PSG(AFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06498 PSG(AFMx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Based on the Court's directive, the Motion to Dismiss #11 is continued to 10/5/2020 at 1:30pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Baumann, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of John W. Baumann, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of John W. Baumann, #4 Proposed Order) (Morgan, Shon)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
July 21, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by plaintiff Deion Walker. (filed in state court 4/27/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
July 21, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does, United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by plaintiff Deion Walker (filed in state court 5/27/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., served on 7/21/2020. (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding Related Case(s): BC592098; CIVDS1935045; 20CV001114 (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-03554-PSG-AFM; 2:20-cv-00378- PSG-AFM; 2:20-cv-05720-PSG-SKx; 5:20-cv-00117-PSG-AFM; 2:18-cv-03012-PSG-AFM (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., identifying Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (Ohio), a corporation; UPS Worldwide Forwarding, Inc., a parent corporation; United Parcel Service of America, Inc., a parent corporation; United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware), a parent corporation; Plaintiff Deion Walker, an individual; and Plaintiffs counsel Lebe Law, APC and Cohelan Khoury & Singer. (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of John W. Baumann ISO Notice of Removal filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NAR, #2 Exhibit LA Superior Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notice to Superior Court of Removal, #4 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Parties)(Morgan, Shon)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV16019 Receipt No: ACACDC-27300152 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit FAC, #3 Exhibit ADR Information, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit Stipulation, #7 Exhibit Summons, #8 Exhibit NAR, #9 Exhibit Request for Dismissal of 5th COA, #10 Exhibit Order re Initial CMC, #11 Exhibit Order Dismissing 5th COA) (Attorney Shon Morgan added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Morgan, Shon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deion Walker v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: John Wall Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deion Walker
Represented By: Jonathan M Lebe
Represented By: Michael D Singer
Represented By: James Jason Hill
Represented By: Rosemary Carol Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?