Mary Bridges v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mary Bridges
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Zamudio and Does 1 to 50 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06524
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mary Bridges, identifying Costco Wholesale Corporation and Anthony Stout. (Giannamore, Mark)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2020. (cw)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DKT. 9 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: In light of filing of an Answer by Defendants on July 30, 2020 (Dkt. #10 ) the Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution is discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark Joseph Giannamore on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Bridges (Attorney Mark Joseph Giannamore added to party Mary Bridges(pty:pla))(Giannamore, Mark)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Zamudio.(Kim, Nina)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The case was removed to this Court. Pursuant to Rule 81 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a response to the Complaint is due the later of 21 days after receiving a copy of the initial pleading, 21 days after being served with the summons, or 7 days after the notice of removal is filed. The notice of removal states service was effected as to both defendants on June 22, 2020, and the removal was filed on July 22, 2020. Therefore, a response to the Complaint was due by July 29, 2020; no response has been filed. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing on or before August 6, 2020, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. Therefore, the Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response, the filing of an answer by Defendant, and/or an application for the entry of default pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pbl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
July 22, 2020 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does 1 to 50 Inclusive, Frank Zamudio., filed by Plaintiff Mary Bridges. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/4/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Frank Zamudio re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Zamudio. (Kim, Nina)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Zamudio. (Kim, Nina)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Zamudio, identifying Mary Bridges, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Frank Zamudio. (Kim, Nina)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Frank Zamudio. (Kim, Nina)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV21067 Receipt No: ACACDC-27318577 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Frank Zamudio, Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attorney Nina J Kim added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Nina J Kim added to party Frank Zamudio(pty:dft))(Kim, Nina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mary Bridges v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bridges
Represented By: Siamak Vaziri
Represented By: Mark Joseph Giannamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Nina J Kim
Represented By: Stacy Ruth Goldscher
Represented By: James J Yukevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Zamudio
Represented By: Nina J Kim
Represented By: Stacy Ruth Goldscher
Represented By: James J Yukevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?