Kaweah Delta Health Care District et al v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: Marin General Hospital, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN doing business as Huntington Hospital also known as Huntington Memorial Hospital, County of Riverside doing business as Riverside University Health Systems - Medical Center also known as Riverside County Regional Medical Center, County of Contra Costa doing business as Contra Costa Regional Medical Center, County of San Bernardino doing business as Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership doing business as Good Samaritan Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association doing business as Dameron Hospital, Chinese Hospital Association doing business as Chinese Hospital, Riverside County Regional Medical Center, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare doing business as Casa Colina Hospital, Kern County Hospital Authority doing business as Kern Medical Center, American Hospital Management Corporation doing business as Mad River Community Hospital, Watsonville Hospital Corporation doing business as Watsonville Community Hospital, County of Monterey doing business as Natividad Medical Center, City of El Centro doing business as El Centro Regional Medical Center, Enloe Medical Center, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Community Memorial Health System doing business as Community Memorial Hospital San Buenaventura, CMCM, Inc. doing business as College Hospital Costa Mesa, County of Ventura doing business as Ventura County Medical Center, Tri-City Hospital District doing business as Tri-City Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District doing business as San Gorgonio Memorial Hospital, San Benito Health Care District doing business as Hazel Hawkins Memorial Hospital, El Camino Hospital, Deanco Healthcare, LLC doing business as Mission Community Hospital, Beverly Community Hospital Association doing business as Beverly Hospital, Eisenhower Medical Center, County of San Mateo doing business as San Mateo Medical Center, Oak Valley Hospital District, CHLB, LLC doing business as College Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation doing business as Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital doing business as Henry Mayo Newhall Hospital, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System doing business as Salinas Valley Memorial Hospital, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation doing business as Pacifica Hospital of the Valley, The County of Santa Clara doing business as Santa Clara Valley Medical Center doing business as St. Louise Regional Hospital doing business as O Connor Hospital, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc. doing business as San Antonio Regional Hospital, Oroville Hospital, Huntington Memorial Hospital, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Washington Township Health Care District doing business as Washington Hospital, MarinHealth Medical Center, Northbay Healthcare Group doing business as Northbay Medical Center, Somona Valley Health Care District doing business as Somona Valley Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District doing business as Kaweah Delta Medical Center, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Antelope Valley Healthcare District doing business as Antelope Valley Hospital, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC doing business as Bakersfield Heart Hospital, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. doing business as Hollywood Presbyterian Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District doing business as Sierra View Medical Center and Marshall Medical Center
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Case Number: 2:2020cv06564
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Bookman, Lloyd)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Processing Department. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William Barr, US Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Alex Azar, Secretary, US Dept. of Health and Human Servs.. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Bookman, Lloyd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar. (shb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: Please remove et al from the caption of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,,,,,, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Bookman, Lloyd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Hospital Management Corporation, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Beverly Community Hospital Association, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., CHLB, LLC, CMCM, Inc., Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Chinese Hospital Association, City of El Centro, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Community Memorial Health System, County of Contra Costa, County of Monterey, County of Riverside, County of San Bernardino, County of San Mateo, County of Ventura, Dameron Hospital Association, Deanco Healthcare, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, El Camino Hospital, Enloe Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, Kern County Hospital Authority, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Madera Community Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Marshall Medical Center, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, Northbay Healthcare Group, Oak Valley Hospital District, Oroville Hospital, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Redlands Community Hospital, Saint Agnes Medical Center, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., San Benito Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, The County of Santa Clara, Tri-City Hospital District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation. (Bookman, Lloyd)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27333457 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs San Benito Health Care District, County of Riverside, County of Ventura, Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula, Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System, Heart Hospital of BK, LLC, Eisenhower Medical Center, CHLB, LLC, Kaweah Delta Health Care District, San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc., Enloe Medical Center, Lompoc Valley Medical Center, Sierra View Local Health Care District, Somona Valley Health Care District, San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District, El Camino Hospital, City of El Centro, Oroville Hospital, Washington Township Health Care District, Valley Presbyterian Hospital, Dameron Hospital Association, Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership, Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare, Methodist Hospital of Southern California, The County of Santa Clara, Marin General Hospital, County of Contra Costa, Kern County Hospital Authority, Tri-City Hospital District, Chinese Hospital Association, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Marshall Medical Center, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN, Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District, Antelope Valley Healthcare District, Watsonville Hospital Corporation, Beverly Community Hospital Association, Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Northbay Healthcare Group, CMCM, Inc., Madera Community Hospital, Oak Valley Hospital District, County of Monterey, Redlands Community Hospital, American Hospital Management Corporation, CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P., Saint Agnes Medical Center, County of San Mateo, Community Memorial Health System, Pacifica of the Valley Corporation, County of San Bernardino, Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party American Hospital Management Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Antelope Valley Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Beverly Community Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. (pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CHLB, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party CMCM, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Chinese Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party City of El Centro(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Community Memorial Health System(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Contra Costa(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Monterey(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Riverside(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of San Mateo(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party County of Ventura(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Dameron Hospital Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Deanco Healthcare, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Eisenhower Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party El Camino Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Enloe Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Heart Hospital of BK, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Kaweah Delta Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Kern County Hospital Authority(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Lompoc Valley Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Madera Community Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Marin General Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Marshall Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Methodist Hospital of Southern California(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Northbay Healthcare Group(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Oak Valley Hospital District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Oroville Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pacifica of the Valley Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Redlands Community Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Saint Agnes Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Benito Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Sierra View Local Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Somona Valley Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party The County of Santa Clara(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Tri-City Hospital District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Valley Presbyterian Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Washington Township Health Care District(pty:pla), Attorney Lloyd Alan Bookman added to party Watsonville Hospital Corporation(pty:pla))(Bookman, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaweah Delta Health Care District et al v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin General Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasadena Hospital Association, LTN doing business as Huntington Hospital also known as Huntington Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Riverside doing business as Riverside University Health Systems - Medical Center also known as Riverside County Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Contra Costa doing business as Contra Costa Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of San Bernardino doing business as Arrowhead Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Samaritan Hospital, a California Limited Partnership doing business as Good Samaritan Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameron Hospital Association doing business as Dameron Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinese Hospital Association doing business as Chinese Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverside County Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare doing business as Casa Colina Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kern County Hospital Authority doing business as Kern Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hospital Management Corporation doing business as Mad River Community Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watsonville Hospital Corporation doing business as Watsonville Community Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Monterey doing business as Natividad Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of El Centro doing business as El Centro Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enloe Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Memorial Health System doing business as Community Memorial Hospital San Buenaventura
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMCM, Inc. doing business as College Hospital Costa Mesa
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Ventura doing business as Ventura County Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-City Hospital District doing business as Tri-City Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redlands Community Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Gorgonio Memorial Healthcare District doing business as San Gorgonio Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Benito Health Care District doing business as Hazel Hawkins Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Camino Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanco Healthcare, LLC doing business as Mission Community Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Community Hospital Association doing business as Beverly Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eisenhower Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of San Mateo doing business as San Mateo Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oak Valley Hospital District
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHLB, LLC doing business as College Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Luther King Jr.- Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation doing business as Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Methodist Hospital of Southern California
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Agnes Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madera Community Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital doing business as Henry Mayo Newhall Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salinas Valley Memorial Health Care System doing business as Salinas Valley Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica of the Valley Corporation doing business as Pacifica Hospital of the Valley
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The County of Santa Clara doing business as Santa Clara Valley Medical Center doing business as St. Louise Regional Hospital doing business as O Connor Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Antonio Regional Hospital Inc. doing business as San Antonio Regional Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oroville Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lompoc Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Township Health Care District doing business as Washington Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MarinHealth Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northbay Healthcare Group doing business as Northbay Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Somona Valley Health Care District doing business as Somona Valley Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaweah Delta Health Care District doing business as Kaweah Delta Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antelope Valley Healthcare District doing business as Antelope Valley Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Hospital of the Monterey Peninsula
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heart Hospital of BK, LLC doing business as Bakersfield Heart Hospital
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHA Hollywood Medical Center, L.P. doing business as Hollywood Presbyterian Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra View Local Health Care District doing business as Sierra View Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Medical Center
Represented By: Lloyd Alan Bookman
Represented By: David J Vernon
Represented By: David Jacob Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?