Erica Reiners v. Chou Team Realty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erica Reiners
Defendant: Mikael Van Loon, Lend Tech Loans, Inc., Jawad Nesheiwat, Eduardo Martinez, Sean Cowell, Chou Team Realty, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as MonsterLoans and Thomas Chou
Case Number: 2:2020cv06587
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
2 Judge: James V Selna
3 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CHOU TEAM REALTY, LLC, SEAN COWELL, MIKAEL VAN LOON, AND THOMAS CHOU TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #42 by Judge James V. Selna. The deadline for Chou Team Realty, LLC, Sean Cowell, Mikael Van Loon, and Thomas Chou to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to October 30, 2020. (es)
October 14, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 30, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Chou Team Realty, LLC dba MonsterLoans, Sean Cowell, Thomas Chou, Mikael Van Loon Thomas Chou, Chou Team Realty, LLC, Sean Cowell, Mikael Van Loon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stipulation)(Price, Benjamin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Courtney Marie Serrato counsel for Defendants Thomas Chou, Chou Team Realty, LLC, Sean Cowell, Mikael Van Loon. Adding Courtney M. Serrato as counsel of record for Chou Team Realty, LLC dba MonsterLoans, Sean Cowell, Thomas Chou, Mikael Van Loon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chou Team Realty, LLC dba MonsterLoans, Sean Cowell, Thomas Chou, Mikael Van Loon. (Attorney Courtney Marie Serrato added to party Thomas Chou(pty:dft), Attorney Courtney Marie Serrato added to party Chou Team Realty, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Courtney Marie Serrato added to party Sean Cowell(pty:dft), Attorney Courtney Marie Serrato added to party Mikael Van Loon(pty:dft))(Serrato, Courtney)
October 14, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Lloyd Price counsel for Defendants Thomas Chou, Chou Team Realty, LLC, Sean Cowell, Mikael Van Loon. Adding Benjamin L. Price as counsel of record for Chou Team Realty, LLC dba MonsterLoans, Sean Cowell, Thomas Chou, Mikael Van Loon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chou Team Realty, LLC dba MonsterLoans, Sean Cowell, Thomas Chou, Mikael Van Loon. (Attorney Benjamin Lloyd Price added to party Thomas Chou(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Lloyd Price added to party Chou Team Realty, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Lloyd Price added to party Sean Cowell(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Lloyd Price added to party Mikael Van Loon(pty:dft))(Price, Benjamin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy S Johnson counsel for Defendants Thomas Chou, Chou Team Realty, LLC, Sean Cowell, Mikael Van Loon. Adding Jeremy S. Johnson as counsel of record for Chou Team Realty, LLC dba MonsterLoans, Sean Cowell, Thomas Chou, Mikael Van Loon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chou Team Realty, LLC dba MonsterLoans, Sean Cowell, Thomas Chou, Mikael Van Loon. (Attorney Jeremy S Johnson added to party Thomas Chou(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy S Johnson added to party Chou Team Realty, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy S Johnson added to party Sean Cowell(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy S Johnson added to party Mikael Van Loon(pty:dft))(Johnson, Jeremy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PETER D. LEPISCOPO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION, #3 Supplement DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Supplement Certificate of Service, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lepiscopo, Peter)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS CHOU TEAM REALTY, LLC, SEAN COWELL, MIKAEL VAN LOON, AND THOMAS CHOU TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #36 by Judge James V. Selna. The deadline for Chou Team Realty, LLC, Sean Cowell, Mikael Van Loon, and Thomas Chou to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to October 15, 2020. (es)
October 2, 2020 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 15, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Taylor)
September 30, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. upon Lend Tech Loans, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David C. Holt, counsel for Lend Tech Loans, Inc.. (Smith, Taylor)
September 30, 2020 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. upon Eduardo Martinez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David C. Holt, counsel for Eduardo Martinez. (Smith, Taylor)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #32 by Judge James V. Selna. The response of Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat to the Plaintiff's complaint currently due on or about September 28, 2020, is now due on October 5, 2020. (lom)
September 21, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jawad Nesheiwat answer now due 10/5/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lepiscopo, Peter)
August 26, 2020 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners, upon Defendant Sean Cowell served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Smith, Taylor)
July 30, 2020 Filing 30 [WAIVER OF SUMMONS filed as] PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 upon Jawad Nesheiwat served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020, answer due 9/28/20 served by Waiver of Service service, by Federal statute, upon Peter D. Lepiscopo, Counsel of Record for Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. Remarks: Plaintiff & Defendant Nesheiwat stipulated that a response or answer shall be due on or before September 28, 2020., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. upon Jawad Nesheiwat waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Peter D. Lepiscopo, Counsel of Record for Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. (Lepiscopo, Peter) Modified on 7/31/2020 (lom).
July 30, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Peter D Lepiscopo on behalf of Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat (Attorney Peter D Lepiscopo added to party Jawad Nesheiwat(pty:dft))(Lepiscopo, Peter)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Taylor T. Smith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Erica Reiners, designating Aaron D. Aftergood as local counsel. (es)
July 29, 2020 Filing 27 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Thomas Chou, Chou Team Realty, LLC, Sean Cowell, Lend Tech Loans, Inc., Eduardo Martinez, Jawad Nesheiwat, Mikael Van Loon. (es)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-00043 JVS(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06587 JVS(ADSx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
July 28, 2020 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
July 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Requests #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 . The following error(s) was found: Summons should list as many defendants as can fit in the defendant section of the caption, followed by (see attachment), not just (See Addendum on following page). At least one defendant should be listed in that section. In addition, the "To:" section can indicate as many defendants that will fit, also followed by "see attached list", so in that case only one summons would have to be issued for all of the defendants (instead of 7). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #8 , Summons Request #9 , Summons Request #10 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor T. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Erica Reiners (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27339280) filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners, identifying Aftergood Law Firm; Woodrow & Peluso, LLC. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Aftergood, Aaron)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27339127 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Erica Reiners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Aaron D Aftergood added to party Erica Reiners(pty:pla))(Aftergood, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erica Reiners v. Chou Team Realty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikael Van Loon
Represented By: Benjamin Lloyd Price
Represented By: Courtney Marie Serrato
Represented By: Jeremy S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lend Tech Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jawad Nesheiwat
Represented By: Peter D Lepiscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Cowell
Represented By: Benjamin Lloyd Price
Represented By: Courtney Marie Serrato
Represented By: Jeremy S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chou Team Realty, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as MonsterLoans
Represented By: Benjamin Lloyd Price
Represented By: Courtney Marie Serrato
Represented By: Jeremy S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Chou
Represented By: Benjamin Lloyd Price
Represented By: Courtney Marie Serrato
Represented By: Jeremy S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Reiners
Represented By: Taylor T. Smith
Represented By: Aaron D Aftergood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?