Anthony Bouyer v. Reza Martin, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Bouyer
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and Reza Martin, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06614
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE: Default was entered by the Clerk as to defendant(s) Reza Martin, Inc., et al., on 09/08/2020 #13 . Plaintiff (s) shall file a motion for default judgment no later than 10/13/2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Reza Martin, Inc., a California corporation (bm)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST for Entry of Default against defendant Reza Martin, Inc. filed by plaintiff Anthony Bouyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Re: Entry of Default) (Manning, Joseph)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Declaration of Bouyer)(Manning, Joseph)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Court therefore orders plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than August 28, 2020. (lom)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, upon Defendant Reza Martin, Inc. served on 8/16/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Reza Martin, Inc. (ghap)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27349369 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Bouyer v. Reza Martin, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza Martin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bouyer
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?