STEVEN DEON TURNER JR. v. M. DAILO et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.
Defendant: M. Dailo and A Miles
Case Number: 2:2020cv06688
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Central District of California. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 7/26/2020. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/06/2020. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A. MILES, M. DAILO with Jury Demand, COMPLAINT against A. MILES, M. DAILO with Jury Demand filed by STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/22/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEVEN DEON TURNER JR. v. M. DAILO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dailo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN DEON TURNER JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?