Hyon Lee v. Summit Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hyon Lee
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust, Summit Trustee Services, LLC, Does 1 to 10, inclusive, Summit Management Company, LLC and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06734
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 presently scheduled for hearing on September 4, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Goldstein, Aaron)
August 22, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Plaintiff Hyon Lee. (Kim, Andrew)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 7/31/2020. The case number will now read CV 20-6734-DMG (Ex). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Goldstein, Aaron)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 9/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goldstein, Aaron)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-00980 DMG(Ex). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06734 DMG(Ex). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
July 28, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 10, inclusive, Summit Management Company, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., filed by plaintiff Hyon Lee. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/9/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Summit Trustee Services, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on July 28, 2020. (Goldstein, Aaron)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Summit Trustee Services, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-03814-DMG-E (Goldstein, Aaron)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Summit Trustee Services, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust, identifying Caliber Home Loans, Inc.; U.S. Bancorp. (Goldstein, Aaron)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Summit Trustee Services, LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust. (Goldstein, Aaron)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20CHCV00174 Receipt No: ACACDC-27389560 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust, Summit Trustee Services, LLC. (Attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein added to party Summit Trustee Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Robert Goldstein added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyon Lee v. Summit Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyon Lee
Represented By: Andrew K Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF10 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Trustee Services, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Represented By: David T Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Aaron Robert Goldstein
Represented By: David T Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?