Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi et al v. United States Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi and Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh
Defendant: CHAD F WOLF, Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli, Catherine Barry, Carl C. Risch, United States Embassy in Beirut, Lebanon, Stephen Biegun, Christine Parker, Mike Pompeo United States Department of State, Dorothy Shea, Mike Pompeo, Chad Wolf, United States Department of State and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 2:2020cv06845
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 20-115) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Mark C. Scarsi, this case is transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06845 MCS(PVCx). (rn)
August 6, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Carl C. Risch, Assistant Secretary of State for Consular Affairs. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Christine Parker, Chief, Outreach and Inquiries Division of Visa Services in the Department of State. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Embassy in Beirut, Lebanon. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Dorothy Shea, Charge d'Affaires of US Embassy and Consulate in Lebanon. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Kenneth Cuccinelli, Acting Director, Us Citizenship and Immigration Service. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Catherine Barry, Senior Advisor at US Department State. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Stephen Biegun,Deputy Secretary of State. (yl)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Department of State, Mike Pompeo, Secretary of the United States. (yl)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions on Mondays, Criminal at 10:00 a.m. and Civil at 1:30 p.m. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi, Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh. (Hu, Evan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Hu, Evan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27428040 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh, Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi. (Attorney Evan Hu added to party Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi(pty:pla), Attorney Evan Hu added to party Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh(pty:pla))(Hu, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi et al v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Barry
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl C. Risch
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Embassy in Beirut, Lebanon
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Biegun
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Parker
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Shea
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entesar Najm Abbood Alzuabidi
Represented By: Evan Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid Mohammed Fayyad Fayyadh
Represented By: Evan Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?