210 Brands Incorporated v. Canterbury of New Zealand Limited et al
Plaintiff: 210 BRANDS INCORPORATED
Defendant: CANTERBURY OF NEW ZEALAND LIMITED and PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2020cv06853
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iva)
September 30, 2020 Filing 37 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-105) approved by Chief Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06853 JWH(ASx). (rn)
September 23, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Statement of Decision re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Statement of Decision)(Carroll, Brook)
September 23, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Statement of Decision re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court #24 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Statement of Decision)(Carroll, Brook)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT [filed 8/6/20; Docket No. #12 ]; and ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF 210 BRANDS INCORPORATED'S MOTION TO REMAND [filed 8/25/20; Docket No. #24 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court continues the hearing on Defendant Pentland Group Limited's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporateds Motion to Remand, currently scheduled for September 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m., to October 19, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (iv)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Statement of Decision re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Adams, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Statement of Decision re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court #24 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Adams, Kevin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court #24 filed by Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. (Carroll, Brook)
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 filed by Defendant Pentland Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections)(Adams, Kevin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 28 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court #24 filed by Defendant Pentland Group Limited. (Adams, Kevin)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT [filed 8/6/20; Docket No. #12 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court continues the hearing on Defendant Pentland Group Limiteds Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, currently scheduled for September 14, 2020, at 1:30 p.m., to September 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (iv)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties andtheir counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that willgovern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 8/6/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a SchedulingConference is not necessary. The hearing on September 14, 2020 is vacated and taken offcalendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendantsare dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 5, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: April 9, 2021. (iv)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Beshoy Rizk's Declaration in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on the Motion to Remand) (Carroll, Brook)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 JOINT RULE 26 REPORT filed by Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. (Carroll, Brook)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Robert M. Einhorn Re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing and This Court's Standing Order filed by Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. (Einhorn, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 filed by Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. (Carroll, Brook)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Beshoy Rizk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated, designating Brook J. Carroll as local counsel #18 . (iv)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Einhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated, designating Brook J. Carroll as local counsel #17 . (iv)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beshoy Rizk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/7/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-27540451) filed by Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Carroll, Brook)
August 13, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Einhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/7/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-27540610) filed by Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Carroll, Brook)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Incorrect event selected: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests.. Application.. Appear Pro Hac Vice. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought. Case number is incorrect. It should be 2:20-CV-06853 JFW (ASx). (Thrasher, Lupe)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application #13 , Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Application for Pro Hac Vice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Robert M. Einhorn Brook J Carroll on behalf of Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. RE: Application. PHV fee $400. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carroll, Brook)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Beshoy Rizk Brook J Carroll on behalf of Plaintiff 210 Brands Incorporated. RE: Application. PHV fee $400. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carroll, Brook)
August 7, 2020 PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Beshoy Rizk Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. ACACDC-27540451 for $400 pro hac vice fee. (Carroll, Brook)
August 7, 2020 PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Einhorn Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. ACACDC-27540610 for $400 pro hac vice fee. (Carroll, Brook)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Pentland Group Limited. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Dundon, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of R. Dundon, #3 Declaration of T. Cullen, #4 Exhibit A to Decl. of T. Cullen, #5 Proposed Order) (Adams, Kevin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Kevin A. Adams re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing and This Court's Standing Order filed by Defendant Pentland Group Limited. (Adams, Kevin)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT re Local Rule 7-3 Conference of Counsel on Defendant Pentland Group Limited's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Pentland Group Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Adams, Kevin)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 14, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before August 24, 2020. (iv)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Beshoy Rizk on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert M Einhorn on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED, identifying PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED. (Adams, Kevin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED. (Adams, Kevin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura, case number 56-2020-0054211-CU-BT-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-27429601 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED. (Attorney Kevin A Adams added to party PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED(pty:dft))(Adams, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 210 Brands Incorporated v. Canterbury of New Zealand Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANTERBURY OF NEW ZEALAND LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENTLAND GROUP LIMITED
Represented By: Kevin A Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 210 BRANDS INCORPORATED
Represented By: Diana S Ponce-Gomez
Represented By: Brook J Carroll
Represented By: Beshoy Rizk
Represented By: Robert M Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?