Carmen John Perriv. Allied Consulting and Investment Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Defendant: Allied Consulting and Investment Inc and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06890
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant Allied Consulting and Investment Inc served on 9/7/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by Plaintiff and Plaintiffs counsel to the Courts Order to Show Cause. The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perrito Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Declaration of Perri)(Manning, Joseph)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and any other state law claim asserted in the Complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than August 19, 2020. (lom)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (yl)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Allied Consulting and Investment Inc. (jp)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jp)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27441781 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen John Perriv. Allied Consulting and Investment Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Consulting and Investment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?