Kirk Kara Corp. v. Gabriel Bros Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kirk Kara Corp.
Defendant: Gabriel Bros Inc and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06911
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement filed September 1, 2020 #10 , the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for October 5, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Kirk Kara Corp. Kirk Kara Corp.. (Kassabian, Raffi)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Kassabian, Raffi)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Gabriel Bros Inc. (et)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kirk Kara Corp.. (Kassabian, Raffi)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp., (Bezdikian, Sareen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp.. (Bezdikian, Sareen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp.. (Bezdikian, Sareen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27445530 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp.. (Attorney Sareen Bezdikian added to party Kirk Kara Corp.(pty:pla))(Bezdikian, Sareen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk Kara Corp. v. Gabriel Bros Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Bros Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Kara Corp.
Represented By: Sareen Bezdikian
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?