Kjersti Flaa v. Hollywood Foreign Press Association et al
Plaintiff: Kjersti Flaa
Defendant: Hollywood Foreign Press Association, Tina Johnk Christensen, Lorenzo Soria, Aud Berggren Morisse, Meher Tatna, Aniko Skorka Navai and Does 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv06974
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. upon Meher Tatna waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Robert J. Ellison. (Quinto, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. upon Hollywood Foreign Press Association waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Robert J. Ellison. (Quinto, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. upon Aniko Skorka Navai waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Robert J. Ellison. (Quinto, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa, upon Defendant Tina Johnk Christensen served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tina Johnk Christensen in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Quinto, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Kjersti Flaa, upon Defendant Aud Berggren Morisse served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aud Berggren Morisse in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Quinto, David)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 20-119) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06974-SB-Ex. (aco)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Lorenzo Soria. (Quinto, David)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Tina Johnk Christensen. (ghap)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Meher Tatna. (ghap)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Lorenzo Soria. (ghap)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hollywood Foreign Press Association. (ghap)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aniko Skorka Navai. (ghap)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aud Berggren Morisse. (ghap)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa, identifying Kjersti Flaa, Plaintiff; Hollywood Foreign Press Association, Defendant; Aud Berggren Morisse, Defendant; Tina Johnk Christensen, Defendant; Aniko Skorka Navai, Defendant; Lorenzo Soria, Defendant; Meher Tatna, Defendant. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Quinto, David)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27467658 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kjersti Flaa. (Attorney David W Quinto added to party Kjersti Flaa(pty:pla))(Quinto, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kjersti Flaa v. Hollywood Foreign Press Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Foreign Press Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Johnk Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Soria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aud Berggren Morisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meher Tatna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aniko Skorka Navai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kjersti Flaa
Represented By: David W Quinto
Represented By: Joanna Ardalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?