Ravikumar Arvindbhai Pael et al v. Kenneth T Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: RAVIKUMAR ARVINDBHAI PATEL and ARPITABEL RRAVIKUMAR PATEL
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2020cv07039
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Goldstein on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:20-cv-01099-RCL, from District of Columbia (Washington, DC). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-07039 CBM (PJWx). (ghap)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia
July 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 8/3/2020. (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . This case is hereby transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. Defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within thirty days of the date when this case appears on the electronic docket of the transferee Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/24/2020. (lcrcl3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI (Burch, Alan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2020.]
May 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of All Defendants (Burch, Alan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7064675) filed by RAVIKUMAR ARVINDBHAI PATEL, ARPITABEL RRAVIKUMAR PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Goldstein, Joshua) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravikumar Arvindbhai Pael et al v. Kenneth T Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVIKUMAR ARVINDBHAI PATEL
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARPITABEL RRAVIKUMAR PATEL
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Alan Burch
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Alan Burch
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?