Rhonda Negrillo v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Negrillo and Richard Negrillo
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. and Does 1-20
Petitioner: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD d/b/a Princess Cruises
Case Number: 2:2020cv07093
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/15/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD., identifying Carnival Corporation & plc. (Politis, Nicholas)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #6 filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD..(Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.(pty:dft))(Politis, Nicholas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #6 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. (et)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
August 8, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #6 filed by Plaintiffs Rhonda Negrillo, Richard Negrillo. (Birnberg, Cory)
August 8, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Negrillo(Birnberg, Cory)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Rhonda Negrillo. (Birnberg, Cory)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27530030 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Negrillo. (Attorney Cory A Birnberg added to party Rhonda Negrillo(pty:bkmov))(Birnberg, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhonda Negrillo v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Negrillo
Represented By: Cory A Birnberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Negrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD d/b/a Princess Cruises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.
Represented By: Nicholas S Politis
Represented By: Barbara Elizabeth Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?