Sabena Puri v. United States of America
Petitioner: Sabena Puri
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv07270
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Order re Briefing Schedule filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Briefing Schedule)(Greene, Gavin)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for February 21, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (jre)
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Respondent United States of America. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 (Greene, Gavin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Respondent United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cathrine Reinecke, #2 Declaration of Margaret O'Connor) (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party United States of America(pty:res)) (Greene, Gavin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re: Petition to Quash Third Party Summons Issued to CitiBank, N.A. by the Internal Revenue Service #1 . 1. Respondent shall file an opposition on or before October 13, 2020. 2. Petitioner may file a reply within 14 days of service of the opposition. 3. A telephonic hearing on Petitioner's Petition is set for November 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (hr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sabena Puri, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to T. Garza. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature Indecipherable. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to signed LN - Person in Charge. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Schutzman, Scott)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sabena Puri, upon Defendant United States of America served on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to T. Garza. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature Indecipherable. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to signed LN - Person in Charge. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Schutzman, Scott)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-04792 AFM (rn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. per Local Rule 83-1.3.1 Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-04792-AFM (Schutzman, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A Neiman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Sabena Puri, designating Scott E Schutzman as local counsel. (et)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Neiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Sabena Puri (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27702754) filed by Plaintiff Sabena Puri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case) (Schutzman, Scott)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Neiman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (lh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri, (Schutzman, Scott)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Sabena Puri. (Schutzman, Scott)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to Quash Third Party Summons Issued to Citibank, N.A. by the Internal Revenue Service Receipt No: ACACDC-27603137 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Sabena Puri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons Issued by the IRS, #2 Exhibit B - Tax Convention with India, #3 Exhibit C - Press Clippings, #4 Exhibit D - Press Release re MOU) (Attorney Scott E Schutzman added to party Sabena Puri(pty:bkmov))(Schutzman, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabena Puri v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Gavin L Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sabena Puri
Represented By: Scott E Schutzman
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?