Clifford J. Hill v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Hill
Defendant: Eurostone America, International Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07318
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #6 is granted. If plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he is granted until October 15, 2020, to file a first amended complaint attempting to cure the deficiencies. (iv)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting #10 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion #6 to Dismiss is taken off the 9/17/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 9/17/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Oppo to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rao, Arjun)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Clifford J. Hill, re Declaration #13 , Opposition #12 served on 8/31/2020. (iv)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION OF CLIFFORD J. HILL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANKS' MOTION TO DISMISS RE: Motion to Dismiss Case #6 filed by Plaintiff Clifford J. Hill. (iv)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANKS' MOTION TO DISMISS re: Motion to Dismiss Case #6 filed by Plaintiff Clifford J. Hill. (iv)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Clifford J. Hill. (iv)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rao, Arjun)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
August 13, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Eurostone America, International Inc. (filed in state court 7/30/20, submitted as document 1, p. 150)(esa)
August 13, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Eurostone America, International Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, filed by plaintiff Clifford J. Hill. (filed in state court 6/15/20, submitted as document 1, p. 7) (esa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Rao, Arjun)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rao, Arjun)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court County of Ventura, case number 56-2020-00542494 Receipt No: ACACDC-27622118 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Arjun P Rao added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Rao, Arjun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford J. Hill v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurostone America, International Inc.
Represented By: Mark E Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Arjun P Rao
Represented By: Bryan David Trader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?