BMO Harris Bank, NA v. MNR Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. and BMO Harris Bank, NA
Defendant: MNR Trucking, Inc., Robert Nazaryan and Ruben Martirosyan
Case Number: 2:2020cv07351
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Robert Nazaryan. (yl)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ruben Martirosyan. (yl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #11 , Summons Issued #13 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #14 filed by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank, NA. (Miles, Christopher)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #10 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #14 filed by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank, NA. (Miles, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued #1 as to Defendant Robert Nazaryan. (yl)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant MNR Trucking, Inc. (yl)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank, NA. (Miles, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank, NA. (Miles, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank, NA. (Miles, Christopher)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Corporate Ownership pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank, NA (Miles, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank, NA, identifying BMO Harris Bank N.A., MNR Trucking, Inc., Ruben Martirosyan, Robert Nazaryn. (Miles, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (yl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Miles, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27636653 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Christopher Claiborne Miles added to party BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.(pty:pla))(Miles, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank, NA v. MNR Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNR Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nazaryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Martirosyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank, NA
Represented By: Christopher Claiborne Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?