Nicole Stan et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Mandica Gorgoi, Nicole Stan, Ethan Stan and E. S.
Defendant: Does 1 - 10 inclusive, Princess Cruise Lines, LTD d/b/a Princess Cruises, Does 1-10, inclusive, and each of them and Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. doing business as Princess Cruises
3Rd Party Defendant: Virgin Excursions LLP
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07374
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #17 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.. (Conner, Lisa)
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #21 . The following error(s) was found: (1) The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. (2) Please use AO-441 Form and can be found on the Court website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #17 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.. (Conner, Lisa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #18 . The following error(s) was found: (1) The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. (2) Please indicate as to "THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT" right after Summons in a Civil Action. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
September 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2020. (gga)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #17 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.. (Conner, Lisa)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendant Virgin Excursions LLP, filed by Third Party Plaintiff Princess Cruise Lines, LTD..(Conner, Lisa)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD., identifying Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.; Carnival Corporation & plc; The United Kingdom Mutual Steamship Assurance Association (Europe) Limited. (Conner, Lisa)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD..(Attorney Lisa M Conner added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.(pty:dft))(Conner, Lisa)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #13 Petition to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing Nicole Stan as Guardian ad Litem for E.S. (efc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 PETITION for Appointment of Nicole Stan as Guardian ad Litem for E.S. filed by Plaintiff Nicole Stan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Derbarseghian, Arn)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Mandica Gorgoi, E. S., Nicole Stan, (Derbarseghian, Arn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 PETITION for Appointment of Nicole Stan as Guardian ad Litem for E.S. filed by Plaintiff Nicole Stan. (Derbarseghian, Arn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It appears the name of an individual known to be a minor is contained in documents filed with the Court. Fed R Civ P 5.2(a) requires that a minor's initials (as opposed to a minor's spell-out name) be used on documents filed with this Court, unless the Court orders otherwise. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs.. (ghap)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 17-1. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. (ghap)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Mandica Gorgoi, Ethan Stan, Nicole Stan. (Derbarseghian, Arn)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEETS-FILED as COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 08/14/2020, receipt number 27640805), filed by Plaintiff Nicole Stan, Mandica Gorgoi, Ethan Stan.(Derbarseghian, Arn) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ghap).
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27640805 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Stan, Mandica Gorgoi, Ethan Stan. (Attorney Arn Derbarseghian added to party Mandica Gorgoi(pty:pla), Attorney Arn Derbarseghian added to party Ethan Stan(pty:pla), Attorney Arn Derbarseghian added to party Nicole Stan(pty:pla))(Derbarseghian, Arn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicole Stan et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandica Gorgoi
Represented By: Arn Derbarseghian
Represented By: Amir Abbas Abdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Stan
Represented By: Arn Derbarseghian
Represented By: Amir Abbas Abdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Stan
Represented By: Arn Derbarseghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. S.
Represented By: Amir Abbas Abdizadeh
Represented By: Arn Derbarseghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD d/b/a Princess Cruises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, and each of them
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. doing business as Princess Cruises
Represented By: Lisa M Conner
Represented By: Barbara Elizabeth Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Virgin Excursions LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD.
Represented By: Lisa M Conner
Represented By: Barbara Elizabeth Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?