Gail Parsons v. Crystal Cruises, LLC
Plaintiff: Gail Parsons
Defendant: Crystal Cruises, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv07382
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less). Clerk has updated defendant's answer due deadline to 10/23/2020. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10-23-2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Crystal Cruises, LLC.(Attorney Brian Otis Felder added to party Crystal Cruises, LLC(pty:dft))(Felder, Brian)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gail Parsons, upon Defendant Crystal Cruises, LLC served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss at CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for Service of Process for Crystal Cruises, LLC in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Coone, Aksana)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Crystal Cruises, LLC. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gail Parsons, (Coone, Aksana)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gail Parsons. (Coone, Aksana)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gail Parsons. (Coone, Aksana)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27643235 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gail Parsons. (Attorney Aksana Moshaiv Coone added to party Gail Parsons(pty:pla))(Coone, Aksana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gail Parsons v. Crystal Cruises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Cruises, LLC
Represented By: Brian Otis Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Parsons
Represented By: Aksana Moshaiv Coone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?