Monique Bunn v. Damon Anthony Dash et al
Plaintiff: Monique Bunn
Defendant: Poppington LLC, Raquel Horn, Damon Anthony Dash and Damon Dash Studios
Case Number: 2:2020cv07389
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Having received the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report #100 , the Court hereby discharges the order to show cause dated September 28, 2020 #99 . A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 5, 2020 Filing 100 JOINT REPORT of Per Rule 26 and Court's Order filed by Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Traylor, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/25/2020, the Court set a Scheduling Conference #81 . As required by the Court's 8/25/2020 Order, Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), and Local Rule 26-1, counsel are required to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Instead, each side has filed their unilateral reports #97 , #98 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the parties show cause in writing no later than 10/5/2002, why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to cooperate and participate with opposing counsel in a Rule 26(f) conference and for failure to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. The filing of a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by the deadline will be deemed a satisfactory response. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action for lack of prosecution. The Scheduling Conference on 10/9/2020 is hereby VACATED and will be rescheduled if necessary. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 98 STATUS REPORT RE: RULE 26 / SCHEDULING filed by Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Traylor, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 97 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Plaintiff Only Discovery Plan) ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Monique Bunn.. (Adham, Dina)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions #83 presently scheduled for hearing on September 25, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 2, 2020 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions FRCP Rule 11 #83 filed by Plaintiff Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Brown In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Sanctions)(Adham, Dina)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Monique Bunn, designating Dina Adham as local counsel #93 . (gk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 93 First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Monique Bunn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27831548) filed by Counsel For Plaintiff Monique Bunn. (Adham, Dina)
August 28, 2020 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dina Adham counsel for Plaintiff Monique Bunn. Adding Dina Adham as counsel of record for Monique Bunn for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney For Plaintiff Dina Adham for Monique Bunn. (Attorney Dina Adham added to party Monique Bunn(pty:pla))(Adham, Dina)
August 27, 2020 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC, (Traylor, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit to Motion #86 , Exhibit to Motion #85 , Exhibit to Motion #84 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions FRCP Rule 11 #83 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #79 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. The docket entry indicates that there is a demand for jury trial, however, there is no jury demand on the title page, nor in the body of the Answer, pursuant to Local Rule 38-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #80 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 25, 2020 Filing 86 EXHIBIT A to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions FRCP Rule 11 #83 filed by Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Traylor, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 85 EXHIBIT B to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions FRCP Rule 11 #83 filed by Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Traylor, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 84 EXHIBIT C to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions FRCP Rule 11 #83 filed by Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Traylor, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions FRCP Rule 11 filed by Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SDNY Rule 11 Motion, #2 Exhibit Declaration ISO Rule 11 Motion - SDNY) (Traylor, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 82 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael S Traylor counsel for Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. Adding Michael S. Traylor as counsel of record for Defendants Dash, Horn and Poppington for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Dash, Horn and Poppington. (Traylor, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 81 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
August 25, 2020 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael S Traylor counsel for Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. Xavier Donaldson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Dash, Horn and Poppington. (Traylor, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS, #49 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC.(Traylor, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Xavier Robert Donaldson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Lloyd Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:19-cv-11804-MKV, from U.S. District Court Southern District of New York (Foley Square). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-07389 DMG (JCx). (lh)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 19, 2020 Filing 72 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Southern
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying as moot #69 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice to renewal in the forum where the defendants argued that this case should proceed, the Central District of California. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 10, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Central District of California.(mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 70 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated August 10, 2020 re: Defendants' Motion For Sanctions. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff's counsel, Christopher Brown. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions).(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER re: #23 FIRST MOTION for Default Judgment as to Damon Dash, Poppington LLC and Raquel Horn filed by Monique Bunn, #58 FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case And Enlarge Time To Serve Defendants filed by Monique Bunn, #52 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Poppington LLC, Raquel Horn. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's motions for a default judgment, enlargement of time to serve the defendants, and to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania [ECF #23, 58] are DENIED. The defendants' motion to vacate the Clerk's entry of default and dismiss this case [ECF #52] is GRANTED in part, insofar as the default is vacated for lack of proper service, and DENIED in part, with respect to dismissal. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to TRANSFER this case to the Central District of California and then close the case. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/10/2020) (mro) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael S. Traylor, Attorney for Defendants dated July 15, 2020 re: Response to Plaintiff's Letter of July 14, 2020. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 66 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated July 14, 2020 re: Supplement Defendants Motion To Dismiss and Plaintiff's Cross Motion To Transfer. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-The Dash Group LLC Statement of Information).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 65 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated June 29, 2020 re: Defendants' Motion For Sanctions. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Part 1-Defendants Safe Harbor Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Part 2 Defendants' Motion For Sanctions, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Plaintiff's May 11, 2020 Letter to Defense Counsel, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C- K.T. v Dash First Department Decision).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 64 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Brown in Support re: #58 FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case And Enlarge Time To Serve Defendants.. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Signature Bank Complaint, #2 Exhibit Signature Bank Judgment).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 63 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #58 FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case And Enlarge Time To Serve Defendants. . Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 62 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated June 29, 2020 re: Defendants' Opposition To Motion To Transfer. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 27, 2020 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #58 FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case And Enlarge Time To Serve Defendants. . Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 27, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #52 MOTION to Set Aside Default . . Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 59 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #58 FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case And Enlarge Time To Serve Defendants. . Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 58 FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case And Enlarge Time To Serve Defendants. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Brown in Opposition re: #52 MOTION to Set Aside Default .. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit Exhibit J).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 56 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #52 MOTION to Set Aside Default . . Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Defs' Counsel, Michael S. Traylor in Support re: #52 MOTION to Set Aside Default .. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Def. Raquel Horn in Support re: #52 MOTION to Set Aside Default .. Document filed by Raquel Horn..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Def. Damon Dash in Support re: #52 MOTION to Set Aside Default .. Document filed by Damon Anthony Dash..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Michael Traylor to RE-FILE Document #51 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Joint) of Specially Appearing Defendants. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2020 Filing 51 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Set Aside Default (Joint) of Specially Appearing Defendants. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit / Declaration of D. Dash, #2 Affidavit / Declaration of R. Horn, #3 Affidavit / Declaration of M. Traylor).(Traylor, Michael) Modified on 5/18/2020 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Action Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Statement served on Raquel Horn, Damon Dash and Poppington LLC on 1-2-20. Service was made by Mail pursuant to CCP 415.20 (c). Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Return of Service-Damon Dash, #2 Affidavit Amended Return of Service-Poppington LLC).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 49 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Complaint against Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Monique Bunn. Related document: #8 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F-T Harper Affidavit).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 48 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated April 23, 2020 re: Potential Cross Motion To Transfer. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff must file an amended complaint alleging membership of the entity Defendants and the state or states of citizenship of each member by May 4, 2020. If Plaintiff is unable to properly and specifically plead the existence of subject matter jurisdiction, this action will be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the teleconference that was scheduled to take place on April 21, 2020 is adjourned sine die. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff files an amended pleading by May 4, 2020, Defendants shall file their contemplated motion to vacate the default and a memorandum of law, explaining why there is good cause under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 55, by May 18, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond by June 15, 2020, and Defendants shall reply by June 29, 2020. The Court will determine whether to vacate the default or hold a default judgment hearing based on that briefing if, in the first instance, Plaintiff establishes the existence of subject matter jurisdiction. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2020., Motions due by 5/18/2020., Responses due by 6/15/2020, Replies due by 6/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/17/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Objection to Request for Judicial Notice and Request to Strike (re: Document #45 and #45-1) re: #45 Letter,. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 45 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated April 14, 2020 re: Judical Notice-Defendants Minimum Contacts. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Decision in Brooks v. Dash 19-1944-JSR).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the conference scheduled to take place on April 2, 2020 is adjourned to April 21, 2020 at 11:30 AM and will be held by telephone. All Parties are directed to call the Court's teleconference line at 888-278-0296 at the scheduled time. When prompted, enter Access Code 5195844. The Court will join once all of the parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/25/20) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael S. Traylor, Esq. (Attorney appearing PHV for Defendants) dated March 17, 2020 re: Request to Appear Telephonically on April 2, 2020. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #39 Letter filed by Monique Bunn. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Call Chambers to receive instructions for the teleconference by Friday, March 27 at 4:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/16/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Michael Steven Traylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz) Modified on 3/12/2020 (rz). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Michael Steven Traylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Michael Steven Traylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 39 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated March 11, 2020 re: Conference of April 2, 2020. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 38 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated March 4, 2020 re: Defendants Pre-Motion Conference Docket Entry 34. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B-Poppington LLC Foreign filing in California).(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order denying 30, 34, and 36. The Court will consider the filing at ECF #34 to be a request for a pre-motion conference as required by Rule 4(a)(i) this Courts Individual Rules of Practice. Plaintiff is invited to submit a responsive letter in accordance with those rules, unless she consents to the relief requested in Defendants proposed motion. The Court will conduct a pre-motion conference on April 2, 2020 at 3:00PM in lieu of the default conference previously scheduled. All counsel, including local counsel, should attend the conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Text Only Order) (rz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Letter requesting a hearing date of April 2, 2020 for Defendants Motion to Vacate Default, Quash Service and Dismiss addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Xavier R. Donaldson dated 03/03/2020. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. Return Date set for 4/2/2020 at 03:00 PM..(Donaldson, Xavier) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 35 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated March 3, 2020 re: Defendants Motions-Fatally Flawed (Docket Entry 34). Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Vacate Default., MOTION to Quash Service . ( Return Date set for 4/2/2020 at 03:00 PM.), MOTION to Dismiss .( Return Date set for 4/2/2020 at 03:00 PM.) Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Donaldson, Xavier) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #33 MOTION for Michael Steven Traylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18975959. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA and SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael Steven Traylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18975959. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Donaldson, Xavier) Modified on 3/2/2020 (aea). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 1, 2020 Filing 32 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated March 1, 2020 re: Docket Entry 30-Letter from Attorney Traylor. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
March 1, 2020 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court Order and Docket Enteries 23,24 & 26 served on All Defendants on February 26, 2020. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 29, 2020 Filing 30 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motions to Set Aside Default, Quash Service and Dismss pursuant to Rule 12(b) requesting hearing on 4/2/2020 addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Michael S. Traylor, Esq. (Attorney Seeking Pro Hac Vice Admission) dated February 28, 2020. Document filed by Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Traylor, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Xavier Robert Donaldson on behalf of Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC..(Donaldson, Xavier) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff has moved for a default judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear at a conference on April 2, 2020 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 18C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff must serve a copy of this order, along with an additional copy of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and all supporting documents (ECF # 23, 24, and 26) on each Defendant and thereafter must file adequate proof of service to show that the documents were properly served on the Defendants. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/19/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 27 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Christopher Brown dated February 13, 2020 re: Default Judgment. Document filed by Monique Bunn..(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. #26 Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney Christopher Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #25 Proposed Default Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The amounts in the judgment don't add up, you have differant amounts against differant Defendants, then you have a total of $51,313,547.50. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Default Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) and dated PDF. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/28/2020 (dt). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Monique Bunn in Support re: #23 FIRST MOTION for Default Judgment as to Damon Dash, Poppington LLC and Raquel Horn.. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Bunn v. Bad Boy Decision)(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 23 FIRST MOTION for Default Judgment as to Damon Dash, Poppington LLC and Raquel Horn. Document filed by Monique Bunn.(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 Vacated as per Judges Order dated August 10, 2020 Doc. #68 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Damon Anthony Dash, Poppington LLC and Raquel Horn. (km) Modified on 8/10/2020 (km). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Brown in Support re: #20 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Christopher Brown. RE-FILE Document No. #19 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The clerk's certificate lists the party Damon Anthony Dash d/b/a Damon Dash Studios, however, the defendant is not listed like that on the complaint or the affidavit of service. Please correct the clerk's certificate so that it reflects the way it is on the docket. Also, the clerk's certificate needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default). The affidavit also needs to be filed separately (filed under other answers, affidavit in support of a non-motion). Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (km) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Default of Defendants) (Brown, Christopher) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/24/2020 (km). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/7/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Damon Dash Studios served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020; Damon Anthony Dash served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020; Raquel Horn served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020; Poppington LLC served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raquel Horn. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Poppington LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Damon Dash Studios. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Damon Anthony Dash. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raquel Horn, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Poppington LLC, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damon Dash Studios, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damon Anthony Dash, re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Damon Dash Studios, Damon Anthony Dash, Raquel Horn, Poppington LLC. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E-T. Harper Affidavit)(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Lloyd Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Use the standard AO 440 summons form not the FIOA summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher Lloyd Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331as; Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1367; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher Lloyd Brown to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raquel Horn, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) Modified on 12/27/2019 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Poppington LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) Modified on 12/27/2019 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damon Dash Studios, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) Modified on 12/27/2019 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damon Anthony Dash, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Brown, Christopher) Modified on 12/27/2019 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Monique Bunn.(Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brown, Christopher) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18366214)Document filed by Monique Bunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E- Affidavit of T. Harper)(Brown, Christopher) Modified on 12/27/2019 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monique Bunn v. Damon Anthony Dash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poppington LLC
Represented By: Xavier Robert Donaldson
Represented By: Michael Traylor
Represented By: Michael S Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Horn
Represented By: Xavier Robert Donaldson
Represented By: Michael Traylor
Represented By: Michael S Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Anthony Dash
Represented By: Xavier Robert Donaldson
Represented By: Michael Traylor
Represented By: Michael S Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Dash Studios
Represented By: Xavier Robert Donaldson
Represented By: Michael Traylor
Represented By: Michael S Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Bunn
Represented By: Christopher Lloyd Brown
Represented By: Dina Adham
Represented By: Christopher L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?