JP Parnell v. D. Cueva
Petitioner: J P Parnell
Respondent: D. Cueva
Case Number: 2:2020cv07422
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION in Support of REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner J P Parnell. (et)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38) #2 CV111/CV69) (jtil).
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
August 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on J. P. Parnell. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/17/2020 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on J. P. Parnell. (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against D. Cueva by J. P. Parnell. (Attachments: #1 address)(Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JP Parnell v. D. Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J P Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?