Jacqueline Simmons v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Simmons
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv07453
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jacqueline Simmons, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/21/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Torres - Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aghai, Sima)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline Simmons Re Possible Conflicts of Interest (Aghai, Sima)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (See document for details.) (es)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [IN CHAMBERS] Order re Possible Conflicts of Interest by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: No later than seven days from the date of this order, Plaintiff's counsel must file notice that ALJ Rosenbluth did or did not participate in or preside over Plaintiff's case. (See document for details.) (es)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (es)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: Granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Simmons. (Aghai, Sima)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Simmons, (Aghai, Sima)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline Simmons. (Aghai, Sima)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Simmons. (Aghai, Sima)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Jacqueline Simmons. (Attorney Sima G Aghai added to party Jacqueline Simmons(pty:pla))(Aghai, Sima)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacqueline Simmons v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Simmons
Represented By: Sima G Aghai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?