Marisa Graef v. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marisa Graef
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100, Inclusive, Fedex Ground Package System, Inc,, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07456
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 12/3/2021 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2021 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on September 28, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: May 10, 2021. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: May 14, 2021. (iv)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15 days, filed by Plaintiff Marisa Graef.. (Granberry, Vincent)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marisa Graef, identifying FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Granberry, Vincent)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -J to Supplement to Notice of Removal)(Atalay, Melis)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 83-1.3 AND 83-1.4 (Atalay, Melis)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Evan R. Moses Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Moses, Evan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 28, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 14, 2020. (iv)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
August 18, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Fedex Ground Package System, Inc,.(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Marisa Graef. Filed in State Court on 6/10/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 8/20/2020 (car).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fedex Ground Package System, Inc,, (Atalay, Melis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fedex Ground Package System, Inc,. (Atalay, Melis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV22720 Receipt No: ACACDC-27682154 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fedex Ground Package System, Inc,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Other Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C- Answer to Complaint, #4 Declaration of Andrea K. Cox ISO, #5 Declaration of Alexander M. Chemers ISO) (Attorney Melis Atalay added to party Fedex Ground Package System, Inc,(pty:dft))(Atalay, Melis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marisa Graef v. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc,
Represented By: Melis Atalay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Miller Chemers
Represented By: Melis Atalay
Represented By: Evan R Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Graef
Represented By: Sahag Majarian, II
Represented By: Vincent Charles Granberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?