Zayin Zari Bey v. Los Angeles County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Zayin Zari Bey
Defendant: Ronald Reynolds, D Perez, Alex Villanueva, Edward C Wells and Los Angeles County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv07458
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Zayin Zari Bey, re Complaint #1 , Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge #4 , served on 8/28/20. (hr)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, ORDERING Proof of Service submitted by Plaintiff Zayin Zari Bey received on 8/31/2020 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Lacking case name and number. (et)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo: granting #2 , #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (hr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by plaintiff Zayin Zari Bey. (second application) (esa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by plaintiff Zayin Zari Bey. (esa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendants Los Angeles County Sheriff Department, D Perez, Ronald Reynolds, Alex Villanueva, Edward C Wells Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, filed by plaintiff Zayin Zari Bey. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayin Zari Bey v. Los Angeles County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayin Zari Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward C Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?