Blue Science Solutions, LLC v. Clarentis Holding, Inc.
Plaintiff: Blue Science Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Clarentis Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07464
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TRANSFER ACTION #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > (1) Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; (2) Stay Case; and (3) Transfer Case. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TRANSFER ACTION filed by Defendant Clarentis Holding, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Duke Van Kalken, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Eric J Wu added to party Clarentis Holding, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Wu, Eric)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC, upon Defendant's Agent for Service of Process Clarentis Holding, Inc. served on 9/12/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (McClaren, Anthony)
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC, Court's Initial Standing Order served on September 9, 2020. (McClaren, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #14 as to Defendant Clarentis Holding, Inc. (gk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #14 filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC. (McClaren, Anthony)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #14 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Below the words, "SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION," please indicate, "ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT." The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #14 filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC. (McClaren, Anthony)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Clarentis Holding, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix Redlined Version of First Amended Complaint)(McClaren, Anthony)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/24/2020, the Court ordered Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction ("OSC") #9 . Plaintiff filed a response to the OSC, noting that Plaintiff JDIS's sole member is an individual domiciled in California and thus a citizen of California #12 . Because some jurisdictional facts are not alleged in Plaintiff's Complaint, the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction on the face of the Complaint. The Court DISMISSES the Complaint for lack of jurisdiction, with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file its First Amended Complaint by 9/7/2020. Defendant shall file its response within 15 days after the filing and service of the First Amended Complaint. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC to Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (McClaren, Anthony)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 8/21/2020. The case number will now read CV 20-7464-DMG (MAAx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Complaint fails to adequately plead "complete diversity between the parties," namely, that Defendant is a citizen of a different state than Plaintiff. The Complaint fails to plead the citizenship of any of Plaintiff's owners or members. In light of the foregoing, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by no later than 8/31/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07464 DMG(MAAx). (rn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Anthony K McClaren counsel for Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC. Changing firm name to Perleberg McClaren LLP 3415 South Sepulveda Blvd., Ste. 1100 Los Angeles, California 90034. Changing email and fax to akm@pmlegal.law, 323.426.2405. Filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC. (McClaren, Anthony)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Clarentis Holding, Inc. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC, identifying None.. (McClaren, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC. (McClaren, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC. (McClaren, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27681886 - Fee: $400, filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Blue Science Solutions, LLC. (Attorney Anthony K McClaren added to party Blue Science Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(McClaren, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Science Solutions, LLC v. Clarentis Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Science Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Anthony K McClaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarentis Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J Wu
Represented By: Fadi K Rasheed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?