Thaieesha Sanders v. Sam's West Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Thaieesha Sanders
Defendant: Sam's West Inc., Does 1-50 inclusive and Sam's West Inc. and doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 2:2020cv07468
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Azizi counsel for Plaintiff Thaieesha Sanders. ZANE ZEIDLER is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Thaieesha Sanders. (Azizi, David)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Sam's West Inc. (filed in state court 2/24/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 11)(esa)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Sam's West Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Thaieesha Sanders. (filed in state court 1/6/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sam's West Inc., identifying THAIEESHA SANDERS. (D'Angelo, Bron)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Sam's West Inc.. (D'Angelo, Bron)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV00274 Receipt No: ACACDC-27682628 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Sam's West Inc.. (Attachments: #1 of Bron D'Angelo in Support of Removal, #2 Notice of Lodgment of State File, #3 1 Complaint, #4 2 Civil Case Coversheet, #5 3 Summons, #6 4 Notice of Case Assignment, #7 5 Order on Fee Waiver, #8 6 PI General Order, #9 7 Clerk Certificate of Mailing, #10 8 PI General Order, #11 9 Demand for Jury Trial, #12 10 Answer) (Attorney Bron E D'Angelo added to party Sam's West Inc.(pty:dft))(D'Angelo, Bron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thaieesha Sanders v. Sam's West Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaieesha Sanders
Represented By: Zane Zeidler
Represented By: David Azizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West Inc.
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West Inc. and doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?