Saul Rivera v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Saul Rivera
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07472
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Saul Rivera, identifying Ford Motor Company. (Barry, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Counsel shall file a Notice of Interested Parties on or before 10/7/2020 or face the striking of the Motion to Remand #10 . (jre)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Saul Rivera. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David N. Barry, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Barry, David)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/7/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 9:00 am. (sw)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/18/2020, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Saul Rivera in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/15/2020, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV26705 Receipt No: ACACDC-27684112 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saul Rivera v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Rivera
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?