Larry D. Bishop v. James Robertson
Petitioner: Larry D. Bishop
Respondent: Warden James Robertson
Case Number: 2:2020cv07473
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
2 Judge: John E McDermott
3 Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: Granting #9 Application for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application is GRANTED and that Respondent is granted until November 15, 2020, to file a motion to dismiss the petition for writ of habeas corpus, and until December 13, 2020, to file an answer. (es)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 First APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss and Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent James Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harris, Julie)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06935-RGK(JEM). Case transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07473-RGK(JEM). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (ap)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06935-RGK(JEM). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for 194. The case number will now read as follows: 2:20-cv-07473-VAP(JEM). Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ap)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by respondent James Robertson. Related Case(s): CV 20-06935-RGK (JEM) (Harris, Julie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Julie A. Harris on behalf of respondent James Robertson. (Attorney Julie Ann Harris added to party James Robertson(pty:res))(Harris, Julie)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (28 U.S.C. 2254) N by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. No later than September 14, 2020, Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance. (see document for further details). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-69) (ghap)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 filed by Petitioner Larry D. Bishop. (ghap)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A Donahue.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Larry D. Bishop. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry D. Bishop v. James Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry D. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden James Robertson
Represented By: Julie Ann Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?