Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Australian Fashion Labels Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Defendant: ASOS.com Ltd., BNKR Online Pty Ltd., Nordstrom, Inc a Washington corporation, individually doing business as Nordstrom Rack, BOP LLC a Wisconsin limited liability company doing business as Shopbop.com, Shoptiques, Inc., Australian Fashion Labels Ltd. an Australian limited company individually doing business as Keepsake, Eminent, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually doing business as Revolve, Does 1 through 10,, ASOS US, INC., Century 21 Department Stores LLC, Nordstrom, Inc a Washington corporation, individually and doing business as Nordstrom Rack, Does 1 through 10, Eminent, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually and doing business as Revolve and Australian Fashion Labels Ltd. an Australian limited company individually and doing business as Keepsake
Case Number: 2:2020cv07477
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS AUSTRALIAN FASHION LABELS LTD.,BNKR ONLINE PTY LTD., NORDSTROM, INC., EMINENT, INC., ASOS US, INC., ASOS.COM LTD., CENTURY 21 DEPARTMENT STORES LLC AND BOP LLC' S TIME TO RESPONDTO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO NOVEMBER 9, 2020 #18 by Judge Percy Anderson (lc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nordstrom, Inc answer now due 10/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.(Attorney Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm added to party Nordstrom, Inc(pty:dft))(Schuettenhelm, Jared)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BOP LLC answer now due 10/15/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant BOP LLC.(Attorney Robert T Cruzen added to party BOP LLC(pty:dft))(Cruzen, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/9/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burroughs, Scott)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. upon ASOS.com Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Gordon E. R. Troy, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. upon BNKR Online Pty Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Gordon E. R. Troy, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. upon Australian Fashion Labels Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Gordon E. R. Troy, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant BOP LLC served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Trudy Desbiens - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Eminent, Inc. served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Telos Legal Corp., c/o Susan B. - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Nordstrom, Inc served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporate Creations Network, Inc., Tiffany Phillips - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant Century 21 Department Stores LLC served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Wayland Roberts c/o ASG EQUITIES, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., upon Defendant ASOS US, INC. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathy Hundley c/o Universal Registered Agents, Inc., Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants ASOS US, INC., ASOS.com Ltd., Australian Fashion Labels Ltd., BNKR Online Pty Ltd., BOP LLC, Century 21 Department Stores LLC, Eminent, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc, Shoptiques, Inc. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27685602 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Klauber Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Klauber Brothers, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klauber Brothers, Inc. v. Australian Fashion Labels Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASOS.com Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNKR Online Pty Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc a Washington corporation, individually doing business as Nordstrom Rack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP LLC a Wisconsin limited liability company doing business as Shopbop.com
Represented By: Robert T Cruzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoptiques, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Australian Fashion Labels Ltd. an Australian limited company individually doing business as Keepsake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eminent, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually doing business as Revolve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASOS US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century 21 Department Stores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc a Washington corporation, individually and doing business as Nordstrom Rack
Represented By: Jared Dylan Schuettenhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eminent, Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually and doing business as Revolve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Australian Fashion Labels Ltd. an Australian limited company individually and doing business as Keepsake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klauber Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?