Meredith Mead v. Alclear, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Meredith Mead
Defendant: Alclear, LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07480
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S LAWSUIT, WITHOUT PREJUDICE #15 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson The Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation. Plaintiffs lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice. Each Party shall bear itsown litigation costs and attorneys' fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to pursuant to Federal Rules Civil Procedure, Rule 41(a) filed by PLAINTIFF Meredith Mead. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S LAWSUIT, WITHOUT PREJUDICE)(Fernandez, Isandra)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS OR STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION filed by Plaintiff Meredith Mead. (Fernandez, Isandra)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue, #12 . (Responses due by 9/25/2020, Replies due by 10/9/2020. Motion reset for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.)(Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.) (mrgo)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Case Management Conference, and to Establish Briefing Schedule from October 5, 2020 to October 26, 2020 filed by Defendant Alclear, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoll, Laura)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The initial status conference previously scheduled for 11/02/2020 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 10/5/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Alclear, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Hahn in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Dismiss or Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Hong-An Vu in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Dismiss or Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration, #3 Exhibit A to Hahn Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Hahn Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Hahn Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Hahn Declaration, #7 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Request to Dismiss or Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration; [Proposed] Order, #8 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Proposed Order) (Stoll, Laura)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alclear, LLC answer now due 9/24/2020, filed by Defendant Alclear, LLC.(Stoll, Laura)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/2/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Meredith Mead, upon Defendant Alclear, LLC served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/03/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Alclear, LLC, Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Meredith Mead. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Alclear, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on 8/18/2020. (Stoll, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alclear, LLC identifying Alclear Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Stoll, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Alclear, LLC. (Stoll, Laura)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV19395 Receipt No: ACACDC-27687381 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Alclear, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Laura Alexandra Stoll added to party Alclear, LLC(pty:dft))(Stoll, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith Mead v. Alclear, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alclear, LLC
Represented By: Laura Alexandra Stoll
Represented By: Hong-An Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Mead
Represented By: James R Hawkins
Represented By: Isandra Y Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?