Legendary Structures, Inc. v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Legendary Structures, Inc.
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07490
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-110) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07490-SB-JCx. (mrgo)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 [STATE COURT] COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 08/19/2020, receipt number 27697444), filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Smith, Ted) Modified on 9/23/2020 (mrgo).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/2/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/18/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #2 )(lh)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, filed by Plaintiff Legendary Structures, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/22/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #2 ) (lh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ted A Smith counsel for Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. Adding Ann K. Johnston as counsel of record for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Smith, Ted)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Ted)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV19557 Receipt No: ACACDC-27697444 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Case Assignment and Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Notice of Change of Address, #5 Answer filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company) (Attorney Ted A Smith added to party Navigators Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Ted)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Smith, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legendary Structures, Inc. v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ted A Smith
Represented By: Ann Kathryn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legendary Structures, Inc.
Represented By: Leo Edward Lundberg, Jr
Represented By: Michael Danton Richardson
Represented By: Michael A Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?