Julie Flores v. AccessLex Institute et al
Plaintiff: Julie Flores
Defendant: Does 1-100, Access Group Education Lending and AccessLex Institute doing business as Access Group doing business as Access Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07493
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case number 20GDCV00378. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AccessLex Institute, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on August 19, 2020. (Sasso, Marcos)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #8 . Document # 8 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk issued the Notice of Deficiencies regarding the Notice of Interested Parties in error. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/19/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) Modified on 8/19/2020 (ghap).
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Thomas F Burke on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John C Grugan on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP, identifying no parent corporation. (Sasso, Marcos)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Access Group Education Lending, AccessLex Institute, Does 1-100. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Julie Flores. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/3/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D) (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP. (Sasso, Marcos)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20GDCV00378 Receipt No: ACACDC-27697275 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Marcos Daniel Sasso added to party ACCESSLEX INSTITUTE dba ACCESS GROUP(pty:dft))(Sasso, Marcos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julie Flores v. AccessLex Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Group Education Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AccessLex Institute doing business as Access Group doing business as Access Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marcos Daniel Sasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?