Joseph Boudrie v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Boudrie
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv07502
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Motion to Remand #15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is accepted as filed. The hearing date has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Remand #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudrie. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Barry, David)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 20-09, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On 9/25/2020, Defendant Ford Motor Company filed a Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #9 (the "Stipulation"). Concurrently with the filing of the Stipulation, Defendant filed its Answer #10 and a Declaration of Matthew M. Proudfoot #11 . The relief requested in the Stipulation is DENIED as moot. The parties are reminded that compliance with the Local Rules is mandatory; the Court did not receive the required word-processing version of the proposed Order to the Stipulation (see Local Rule 5-4.4). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #10 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 25, 2020 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 10/19/2020 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Joseph Boudrie in Ventura Superior Court on 6/24/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura, case number 56-2020-00542913-CU-BC-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-27699725 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Boudrie v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Boudrie
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?