Thomas Hardwick v. Hoovestol, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Hardwick
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Hoovestol Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07505
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hoovestol Inc..(Attorney Thomas Michael Downey added to party Hoovestol Inc.(pty:dft))(Downey, Thomas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rohit A Sabnis counsel for Defendant Hoovestol Inc.. Rohit Ashok Sabnis is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hoovestol, Inc.. (Sabnis, Rohit)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Arthur Slezak Gaus counsel for Defendant Hoovestol Inc.. Adding Arthur Slezak Gaus as counsel of record for Hoovestol, Inc., a Minnesota Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hoovestol, Inc.. (Gaus, Arthur)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because the incorrect case type was used at case opening. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:20-cv-07505 DMG (MAAx). The previous case number, 2:20-mc-00078, is hereby terminated. (esa)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Thomas Hardwick, upon Defendant Hoovestol Inc. served on 7/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon McKayla Sides, Registered Agents, Inc., in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 7/23/20, submitted as document 1, p. 7) (esa)
August 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Hoovestol Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Thomas Hardwick. (filed in state court 5/22/20, submitted as document 1, p. 9) (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hoovestol Inc., identifying None. (Sabnis, Rohit)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Hoovestol Inc.. (Sabnis, Rohit)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number 20STCV19610 Receipt No: ACACDC-27684087 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Hoovestol Inc.. (Attorney Rohit A Sabnis added to party Hoovestol Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Sabnis, Rohit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Hardwick v. Hoovestol, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hardwick
Represented By: James R Hawkins
Represented By: Samantha A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoovestol Inc.
Represented By: Raymond A. Greene
Represented By: Arthur Slezak Gaus
Represented By: Rohit A Sabnis
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Represented By: Raymond A Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?