Rondel Delbert Gardner v. CSP - LAC et al
Plaintiff: Rondel Delbert Gardner
Defendant: Dr. Lee, Accounts Consumers Affairs, Cal. Medical Board, CSP - LAC, CDCR, California Board of Medical and R.N. Kurt
Case Number: 2:2020cv07519
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Valerie Baker Fairbank
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Rondel Delbert Gardner re Summons Issued #8 (hr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 as to Defendants CSP - LAC, Kurt (individual), Kurt (official capacity), Lee, Lee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Summons) (kl)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Granting REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee #4 . (kl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Rondel Delbert Gardner. (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Rondel Delbert Gardner regarding Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 . (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Rondel Delbert Gardner. (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Accounts Consumers Affairs, CDCR, CSP - LAC, Cal. Medical Board, California Board of Medical, Kurt(individual), Kurt(official capacity), Lee, Lee pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Filed by Plaintiff Rondel Delbert Gardner. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rondel Delbert Gardner v. CSP - LAC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accounts Consumers Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal. Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSP - LAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Board of Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Kurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondel Delbert Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?