Latasha Eugenio v. Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC
Plaintiff: Latasha Eugenio
Defendant: Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC doing business as Westlake Financial Services and Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv07523
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Latasha Eugenio. upon Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Edit Alexandryan. (Martin, George)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Martin, George)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Martin, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LATASHA EUGENIO. (Martin, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 LATASHA EUGENIO. (Martin, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27702817 - Fee: $400. (Attorney George Thomas Martin, III added to party LATASHA EUGENIO(pty:pla))(Martin, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latasha Eugenio v. Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Eugenio
Represented By: George Thomas Martin, III
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilshire Commercial Capital, LLC doing business as Westlake Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Portfolio Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?