Richard Allen Williams et al v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Genita E. Johnson and Richard Allen Williams
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., DOES 1-100,, HUAHAI U.S., INC., ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd, Does 1-100 and Huahai U.S., Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv07535
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney on behalf of Defendant Huahai U.S., Inc. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A.am not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (ak)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Conditional Transfer Order - 31 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2875, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Robert B. Kugler. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Huahai U.S., Inc, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd, (Chang, Cyndie)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Huahai U.S., Inc, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd (Chang, Cyndie)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Huahai U.S., Inc, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.(Chang, Cyndie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cyndie M Chang counsel for Defendants Huahai U.S., Inc, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Adding Cyndie M. Chang as counsel of record for Defendants Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Huahai U.S., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Prinston Pharmasceutical, Inc. and Huahai U.S., Inc.. (Attorney Cyndie M Chang added to party Huahai U.S., Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Cyndie M Chang added to party Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cyndie M Chang added to party Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cyndie M Chang added to party Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd(pty:dft))(Chang, Cyndie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 Consent to Removal filed by Defendants Huahai U.S., Inc, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #8 (Chang, Cyndie)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachments No. #1-2 Consent to Removal should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. #1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Seth A Goldberg. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jp)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Huahai U.S., Inc, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Does 1-100. Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Richard Allen Williams, Genita E. Johnson. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/22/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Transferred to Judge Kugler (Johnston, Sarah)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., identifying CVS Health Corporation. (Johnston, Sarah)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Johnston, Sarah)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV19786 Receipt No: ACACDC-27704199 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(Johnston, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Allen Williams et al v. Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Cyndie M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC
Represented By: Cyndie M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAHAI U.S., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Huahai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
Represented By: Cyndie M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huahai U.S., Inc
Represented By: Cyndie M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genita E. Johnson
Represented By: Alvin L Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Allen Williams
Represented By: Alvin L Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?