Orlando Garcia v. Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez and El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,
Case Number: 2:2020cv07556
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,, Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez, (Sievers, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form, #18 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #17 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The Document is Accepted; however, the parties must file their Notice of Interested parties no later than October 16, 2020.. (rfi)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,, Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,, Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sievers, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation Re Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #14 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,, Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Robert P Sievers added to party Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez(pty:dft))(Sievers, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Plaintiff Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc, answer now due 9/28/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Robert P Sievers added to party El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,(pty:dft))(Sievers, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc, served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Delfina Rodriguez in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,, Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez. (et)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, (Handy, Russell)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Handy, Russell)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27716551 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Orlando Garcia(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Garcia v. Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delfina Vildozola Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert P Sievers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Huarache Azteca Restaurant, Inc,
Represented By: Robert P Sievers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?