Andy Chen v. Jim Robertson
Petitioner: Andy Chen
Respondent: Jim Robertson
Case Number: 2:2020cv07558
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER #7 by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: It is hereby ordered that Respondent is GRANTED to October 23, 2020, to file a response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (es)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Declaration of Shezad H. Thakor filed by Respondent Jim Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thakor, Shezad)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Shezad H. Thakor on behalf of Respondent Jim Robertson. (Attorney Shezad Hanif Thakor added to party Jim Robertson(pty:res))(Thakor, Shezad)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Within 14 days, respondents shall file and serve a notice of appearance. That Respondent shall file a response to the Petition within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition for writ of Habeas Corpus) (et)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING REQUIREMENTS FOR PREPARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: Petitioner is advised of the following requirements for preparing and submitting documents in this case: *See document for details.* (Attachments: #1 Order (1 of 2), #2 Petition (2 of 2)) (es)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by petitioner Andy Chen. (esa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Andy Chen. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andy Chen v. Jim Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Robertson
Represented By: Shezad Hanif Thakor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andy Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?