Eugene Seymour, M.D. v. The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Seymour, M.D. and Eugene Seymour
Defendant: The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv07578
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott E Calvert on behalf of Plaintiff Eugene Seymour (Attorney Scott E Calvert added to party Eugene Seymour(pty:pla))(Calvert, Scott)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 COUNTERCLAIM against Eugene Seymour; Jury Demand, filed by Counterclaimants' UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Hess, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 -- and Counterclaimants' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, identifying Unum Group. (Hess, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- and Counterclaimants' filed by Defendants The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Unum Group as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND and affirmative defenses filed by Defendants The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Hess, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 10/15/2020; The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company answer now due 10/15/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants UNUM Life Insurance Company of America; The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Robert E Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eugene Seymour, upon Defendant The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Cayetano - Agent for CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eugene Seymour, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix - Agent for CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. (See Order for further details) (yl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (esa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company. (esa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eugene Seymour, M.D., identifying Eugene Seymour, M.D., The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Horrow, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eugene Seymour, M.D.. (Horrow, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eugene Seymour, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Horrow, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27721780 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Eugene Seymour, M.D.. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Eugene Seymour, M.D.(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eugene Seymour, M.D. v. The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mutual of New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Seymour, M.D.
Represented By: Michael B Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Seymour
Represented By: Scott E Calvert
Represented By: Nichole Dessie Podgurski
Represented By: Michael B Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?